Weston, Bonnie Cynthia (CPSO#: 58303)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 10
838 Somerset Street West
Ottawa ON  K1R 6R7
Phone: (613) 237-5533
Fax: (613) 237-5534
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Eye Care Centre
1967 Riverside Dr.
3rd floor
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 88537
Fax: (613) 738-8394
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Eye Institute
The Ottawa Hospital, General Site
501 Smyth Rd.
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8575
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.C. Weston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Weston ( CPSO# 58303 )

Business Address:
Unit 10
838 Somerset Street West
Ottawa ON  K1R 6R7
Phone Number: (613) 237-5533

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 28 Oct 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BONNIE CYNTHIA WESTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1988