Wharton, Aidan Stephen (CPSO#: 107771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Emergency Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aidan Wharton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wharton ( CPSO# 107771)

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Emergency Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AIDAN STEPHEN WHARTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHARTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 31 Aug 2015 to 27 Sep 2015
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016