Whately, Christopher George (CPSO#: 30945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medcare Orthopaedics and Spine Hosp
Sheikh Zayed Road
Dubai NA
United Arab Emirates
United Arab Emirates
Phone: 01197159616038
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER GEORGE WHATELY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHATELY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Sep 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2010

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On December 30, 2012, at the Dubai Court in United Arab Emirates, a finding of medical negligence and malpractice was made against Dr. Whately in respect of an incident that took place in April of 2009.