Wheatcroft, Mark David (CPSO#: 94366)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2012

Expiry Date:  31 May 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jun 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5212
Fax: (416) 864-6012
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wheatcroft Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wheatcroft ( CPSO# 94366 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Vascular Surgery Effective: 01 Jun 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 18 Nov 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 May 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Mar 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Mark David Wheatcroft may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division  of  Vascular Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Wheatcroft holds  an  academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Wheatcroft no longer holds  the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the  following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating  that  Dr. Wheatcroft
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee  makes  a  decision  about   Dr.  Wheatcroft's
                        certificate  of  registration,  following  consideration   of   the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  June  1,  2012.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs  2  and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on May 31, 2019.