Whelan, John Paul Joseph (CPSO#: 52131)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Paul Whelan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2015