Whittle, Wendy Lynne (CPSO#: 70566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 3-911
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 2452
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wendy Lynne Whittle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Whittle ( CPSO# 70566 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
3rd Floor Room 3-911
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY LYNNE WHITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITTLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Mar 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2004