Whyte, James Fredrick Henry (CPSO#: 86381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
845 Upper James St. Unit #224
Hamilton ON  L9C 3A3
Phone: (905)928-7971
Fax: (905)581-7711
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Whyte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 5 2012


Corporation Name: J. Whyte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Whyte ( CPSO# 86381 )

Business Address:
845 Upper James Street
Suite 224
Hamilton ON  L9C 3A3
Phone Number: (905) 928-7971

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES FREDRICK HENRY WHYTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHYTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2009