Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Wianecki, Richard Joseph (CPSO#: 55860)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Seven Oaks
9 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E1
Phone: (416) 392-3500
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kennedy Lodge
1400 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 4V6
Canada
Phone: (416) 752-8282
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Altamont
92 Island Road
Scarborough ON  M1C 2P5
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-4782
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Winbourne Park
1020 Westney Rd. North
Ajax ON  L1S 4S7
Canada
Phone: (905) 426-6296
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Bayview Extendicare
550 Cummer Ave.
North York ON  M2K 2M2
Canada
Phone: (416) 226-1331
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.J. Wianecki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wianecki ( CPSO# 55860 )

Business Address:
Seven Oaks
9 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E1
Phone Number: (416) 392-3500

Business Address:
1020 Westney Road North
Ajax ON  L1T 4K6
Phone Number: (905) 526-6296

Business Address:
550 Cummer Avenue
North York ON  M2K 2M2
Phone Number: (416) 226-1331

Business Address:
1400 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 4V6
Phone Number: (416) 752-8282

Business Address:
92 Island Road
Scarborough ON  M1C 2P5
Phone Number: (416) 284-4781

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD JOSEPH WIANECKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIANECKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1987