Wickramasinghe, Senani Devananda (CPSO#: 27236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Apr 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Apr 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Ceylon, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Boniface Park Medical Centre
Unit 4
700 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2A7
Phone: (647) 350-6717
Fax: (647) 350-7679
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wickramasinghe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wickramasinghe ( CPSO# 27236 )

Business Address:
Boniface Park Medical Centre
Unit 4
700 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2A7
Phone Number: (647) 350-6717

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Date Received: 14 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SENANI DEVANANDA WICKRAMASINGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WICKRAMASINGHE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1975