Wiebe, Shannon Joan (CPSO#: 80844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 847
904 Ottawa Street
Keewatin ON  P0X 1C0
Phone: (807) 547-2818
Fax: (807) 547-3285
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

District of Kenora Home for the Age
1220 Valley Drive
Kenora ON  P9N 2W7
Canada
Phone: (807) 468-3165
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Birchwood Terrace Nursing Home
237 Lakeview Drive
Kenora ON  P9N 4J7
Canada
Phone: (807) 468-9532
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shannon Wiebe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wiebe ( CPSO# 80844 )

Business Address:
904 Ottawa Street
P.O. Box 847
Keewatin ON  P0X 1C0
Phone Number: (807) 547-2818

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jan 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANNON JOAN WIEBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIEBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2007