Wildgoose, Petra (CPSO#: 97685)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  15 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5959
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETRA WILDGOOSE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. WILDGOOSE is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. WILDGOOSE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. WILDGOOSE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. WILDGOOSE shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. WILDGOOSE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. WILDGOOSE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 15 Jan 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 08 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Jan 2018