Wilkins, Paul James (CPSO#: 68872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
121 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1C3
Phone: (613) 961-7600
Fax: (613) 961-1377
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul J. Wilkins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wilkins ( CPSO# 68872 )

Business Address:
121 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1C3
Phone Number: (613) 961-7600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL JAMES WILKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1997