Willamowicz, Anna Sylvia (CPSO#: 65368)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 King Street West
Suite 210
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K1
Phone: (905) 723-4330
Fax: (905) 723-0204
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Willamowicz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Willamowicz ( CPSO# 65368 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
300 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K1
Phone Number: (905) 723-4330

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA SYLVIA WILLAMOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLAMOWICZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993