Williams, Charles Anthony (CPSO#: 63268)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 985-2661
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles A. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Williams ( CPSO# 63268 )

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 10 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES ANTHONY WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991