Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Williams, Edward Alexander (CPSO#: 66665)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Ext. 2448
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.A. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Williams ( CPSO# 66665 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9

Business Address:
403 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD ALEXANDER WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998