Williams, Olive Joyce (CPSO#: 26021)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Boyce, Olive Joyce (used until: 22 Mar 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of West Indies, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Olive J Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 8 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 25 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 21 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 28, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Williams has ceased to practise pathology in Ontario and will not recommence the practice of pathology in Ontario in any capacity until she has provided notice in writing to the College of her intention to do so at least 30 days prior to the date upon which she is scheduled to recommence the practice of pathology. Should she return to the practice of pathology, she will be required to complete an educational program acceptable to the College and her practice will be subject to supervision for one year, followed by an assessment.