Willits, Kevin Roy (CPSO#: 70147)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Dec 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fowler Kennedy 3M Centre
Sport Medicine Clinic
Western University
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-4121
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin R. Willits Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Willits ( CPSO# 70147 )

Business Address:
Fowler Kennedy Sport Medicine Clinic
3M Centre - Unversity of Western Ontario
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-4121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN ROY WILLITS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLITS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2002