Willoughby, Rodney Peter Norman (CPSO#: 65488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sudbury Vascular Laboratory
Unit 3 4 5
2140 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 5S8
Phone: (705) 522-4611
Fax: (705) 522-4158
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Sciences North
41 Ramsay Lake Road
Sudbury, ON
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (705) 671-1000
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rod Willoughby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Willoughby ( CPSO# 65488 )

Business Address:
Oaks Plaza
Suite 3-4-5
2140 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 5S8
Phone Number: (705) 522-4611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RODNEY PETER NORMAN WILLOUGHBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLOUGHBY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993