Wilson, Dale Robert (CPSO#: 55570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone: (519) 661-0047
Fax: (519) 661-0917
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dale R. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wilson ( CPSO# 55570 )

Business Address:
Suite 306
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone Number: (519) 661-0047

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALE ROBERT WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1988