Wilson, Janet Lee (CPSO#: 55520)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone: (519) 661-0100
Fax: (519) 661-0917
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janet L. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wilson ( CPSO# 55520 )

Business Address:
Suite 306
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone Number: (519) 661-0100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET LEE WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1988