Wilson, Kumanan Rasihan (CPSO#: 66989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Box 209
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 13056
Fax: (613) 761-4186
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kumanan Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wilson ( CPSO# 66989 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Room 1019
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KUMANAN RASIHAN WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997