Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Wilson, Martha Kaetlen (CPSO#: 62669)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Strickland Street
Lakefield ON  K0L 2H0
Phone: (705) 651-0222
Fax: (705) 651-0224
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kaetlen Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 62669 )

Business Address:
150 Strickland Street
Lakefield ON  K0L 2H0
Phone Number: (705) 651-0222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTHA KAETLEN WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1992