Windrim, Rory Christopher (CPSO#: 69539)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 3-905
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8725
Fax: (416) 586-8617
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rory Windrim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Windrim ( CPSO# 69539 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 3905
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RORY CHRISTOPHER WINDRIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINDRIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1996