Windsor, Scott James (CPSO#: 33253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Scott Windsor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Windsor ( CPSO# 33253 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients requesting a copy of their medical records may contact: Record Storage and Retrieval Services at 1-888-563-3732 ext 1.
Date Received: 25 Jul 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT JAMES WINDSOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINDSOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1982