Winrob, Ilana Kort (CPSO#: 96376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
118 7th Ave
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone: 519-364-2820
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ilana Winrob Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Winrob ( CPSO# 96376 )

Business Address:
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone Number: (519) 364-2829

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
55 Isla Street
Markdale ON  N0C 1H0
Phone Number: (519) 986-3040

Business Address:
21 McGivern Street
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0
Phone Number: (519) 881-1220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILANA KORT WINROB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINROB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015