Winsor, Stephanie Heather Malaika (CPSO#: 66414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynecology
H S C 4D9
1280 Main Street
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L8
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76253
Fax: (905) 527-2675
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie H.M. Winsor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Winsor ( CPSO# 66414 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
HSC 4D9 - 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE HEATHER MALAIKA WINSOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINSOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Jan 2002
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998