Winter, Igor Alexander (CPSO#: 68730)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1145 Carling Ave.
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 7361
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 island lodge road
Ottawa ON  K1N 5M2
Canada
Phone: (612) 580-2424 Ext. 22910
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

2865 riverside drive
Ottawa ON  K1V 8N5
Canada
Phone: (613) 731-4660
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group,Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Oct 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IGOR ALEXANDER WINTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 1995 to 28 Jun 1995
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1996