Wise, Michelle Rosanne (CPSO#: 72548)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Szecket & Dr. Michelle Wise Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 1 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 15 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2010