Withers, Nicholas Joseph (CPSO#: 73096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cowichan District Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
3045 Gibbins Road
Duncan BC  V9L 1E5
Phone: (250) 737-2030
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas J. Withers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 11 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: Perth & Smiths Falls District Hospital 60 Cornelia Street Smiths Falls ON K7A 2H9
Date Received: 30 Jul 2013

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 21 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS JOSEPH WITHERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITHERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2017