Wobeser, Wendy Lee (CPSO#: 62351)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
221 Queen Street
Kingston, ON
Kingston ON  K7K 1B4
Phone: (613) 572-2978
Fax: 613-900-1049
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wobeser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Wobeser ( CPSO# 62351 )

Business Address:
Queens University
94 Stuart Street
3009 Etherington Hall
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2978

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 07 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY LEE WOBESER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOBESER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1993