Wojcicki, Andrzej Tomasz (CPSO#: 64521)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Dec 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Bialystok University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6165 Vivian Road
Mount Albert ON  L0G 1M0
Phone: (905) 473-4117
Fax: (905) 473-1235
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Wojcicki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wojcicki ( CPSO# 64521 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
6165 Vivian Road
Mount Albert ON  L0G 1M0
Phone Number: (905) 473-4117

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1996
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2016
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2016
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 22 Apr 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., February 22, 2016, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Andrzej Tomasz Wojcicki:

            Education
            (a)   Dr. Wojcicki shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully
                  complete the following educational courses:
                        i. McMaster University Review Course in Internal Medicine (March
                        30, 2016 to April 1, 2016); and
                        ii.Canadian Cardiovascular Research Network course entitled
                        "Gauging the Guidelines" (February 27, 2016);
                  
            Office Practice Clinical Supervision
            (b)   Within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, Dr. Wojcicki shall
                  obtain a clinical supervisor acceptable to the College, who will
                  supervise Dr. Wojcicki's internal medicine office practice (the "Office
                  Practice Clinical Supervision") for a period of six (6) months, and who
                  will sign an undertaking in the form attached hereto as Schedule "B" (the
                  "Office Practice Clinical Supervisor");

            (c)   The Office Practice Clinical Supervision shall be at a moderate level for
                  a minimum of six (6) months, commencing on the date following the expiry
                  of the suspension of Dr. Wojcicki's certificate of registration.  The
                  Office Practice Clinical Supervisor will meet with Dr. Wojcicki bi-weekly
                  and review ten (10) of Dr. Wojcicki's patient charts, discuss  Dr.
                  Wojcicki's patient care, treatment plan and follow-up, identify any
                  concerns regarding the care, treatment plan and follow-up and make
                  recommendations for improvement; 

            (d)   After three (3) months, and only upon recommendation by the Office
                  Practice Clinical Supervisor and approval of the College, the Office
                  Practice Clinical Supervision may be reduced to a low level for the
                  remaining three (3) months,  such that the frequency of meetings and
                  chart reviews by the Office Practice  Clinical Supervisor shall be
                  reduced to monthly;

            (e)   Within six (6) months after the completion of the Office Practice
                  Clinical Supervision, Dr. Wojcicki will submit to a reassessment of his
                  internal medicine office practice (the "Office Practice Reassessment") by
                  an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Office Practice
                  Assessor(s)").  The Office Practice Reassessment may include a chart
                  review, direct observation of Dr. Wojcicki's care, interviews with
                  colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools
                  deemed necessary by the College.  Dr. Wojcicki shall abide by all
                  recommendations made by the Office Practice Assessor(s), and the results
                  of the Office Practice Reassessment will be reported to the College and
                  may form the basis of further action by the College;

            Hospital Practice Clinical Supervision
            (f)   Within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, Dr. Wojcicki shall
                  obtain a clinical supervisor acceptable to the College, who will
                  supervise Dr. Wojcicki's hospital practice (the "Hospital Clinical
                  Supervision") for a period of three (3) months, and who will sign an
                  undertaking in the form attached hereto as Schedule "C" (the "Hospital
                  Clinical Supervisor");

            (g)   Hospital Clinical Supervision will commence on the date following the
                  expiry of the suspension of Dr. Wojcicki's certificate of registration.
                  The Hospital Clinical Supervisor will meet with Dr. Wojcicki monthly and
                  review charts for every patient where Dr. Wojcicki has been the Most
                  Responsible Physician, discuss  Dr. Wojcicki's patient care, including
                  documentation and record-keeping, treatment plan and follow-up, identify
                  any concerns regarding the care, documentation, record-keeping, treatment
                  plan and follow-up and make recommendations for improvement;

            (h)   Within six (6) months after the completion of the Hospital Clinical
                  Supervision, Dr. Wojcicki will submit to a Reassessment of his hospital
                  practice (the "Hospital Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                  selected by the College (the "Hospital Assessor(s)").  Hospital
                  Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of Dr.
                  Wojcicki's care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                  patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College. Dr.
                  Wojcicki shall abide by all recommendations made by the Hospital
                  Assessor(s), and the results of the Hospital Reassessment will be
                  reported to the College and may form the basis of further action by the
                  College;

            Collective Clinical Supervision

            (i)   Dr. Wojcicki shall cooperate fully with the Office Practice Clinical
                  Supervision and Hospital Clinical Supervision and abide by all
                  recommendations of his Clinical Supervisor(s) with respect to practice
                  improvements and education;

            (j)   Dr. Wojcicki shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Supervisors
                  to the College, and by the College to his Clinical Supervisors, of all
                  information the Clinical Supervisors or the College deems necessary or
                  desirable in order to fulfill the Clinical Supervisors' undertaking and
                  to monitor Dr. Wojcicki's compliance with this Order.  This shall
                  include, without limitation, providing the Clinical Supervisors with any
                  reports of any assessments of Dr. Wojcicki's practice in the College's
                  possession; 

            (k)   If a Clinical Supervisor(s) who has given an undertaking in Schedule "B"
                  and/or Schedule "C" to this Order is unable or unwilling to continue to
                  fulfill its terms, Dr. Wojcicki shall, within twenty (20) days of
                  receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form
                  from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and
                  ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time;

            (l)   If Dr. Wojcicki is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor in accordance
                  with paragraphs 5(b), 5(f) or 5(k) of this Order, he shall cease
                  practising medicine until such time as he has done so, and the fact that
                  he has will constitute a term, condition or limitation on his certificate
                  of registration until that time; 

            (m)   Dr. Wojcicki shall co-operate with unannounced inspections and shall
                  consent to the monitoring of his OHIP billings of his Office Practice and
                  his Hospital Practice by a College representative(s), for the purpose of
                  monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order;

            (n)   Dr. Wojcicki shall inform the College of each and every location that he
                  practises or has privileges, including, but not limited to, hospital(s),
                  clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction within fifteen (15) days of
                  this Order, and shall inform the College of any and all new Practice
                  Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                  location;

            (o)   Dr. Wojcicki shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with
                  implementing the terms of this Order.



            As from February 19, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr.  Andrzej Tomasz
            Wojcicki, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.Wojcicki to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                           (''Undertaking'')

                                                  of

                                      DR. ANDRZEJ TOMASZ WOJCICKI
                                           ("Dr. Wojcicki")

                                                  to

                            COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO 
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the
                  Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991,  c. 18, as amended;
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Wojcicki, certificate of registration number 64521, am a member of
                  the College. The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice and, specifically, my standard of practice in complementary
                  and alternative medicine.

            (3)   I, Dr.Wojcicki, acknowledge and agree that the College referred
                  allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence to the Discipline
                  Committee in a Notice of Hearing dated November 7, 2014 and October 14,
                  2015.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr.Wojcicki, understand and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it.

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr.Wojcicki, undertake that, effective immediately, I will cease
                        to engage in complementary and alternative medicine in any respect
                        in Ontario.

                  (b)   I, Dr. Wojcicki, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply to
                        practise complementary and alternative medicine in Ontario.
                  
            (6)   Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr.Wojcicki, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall post
                        a sign in the waiting room(s) of all my primary care Practice
                        Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                        set out at Appendix "A." For further clarity, this sign shall state
                        as follows: "Dr. Wojcicki must not practise complementary and
                        alternative medicine. Further information may be found on  the
                        College of  Physicians and  Surgeons of  Ontario website at
                        www.cpso.on.ca. 
                  
            (7)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr.Wojcicki, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I engage in primary care, in Ontario (my primary
                        care "Practice Locations") within fifteen (15) days of executing
                        this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the
                        College of any and all new primary care Practice Locations in
                        Ontario within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr.Wojcicki, undertake and agree that I shall submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my primary care Practice
                        Locations in Ontario, patient charts and/or other records that are
                        maintained in my primary care Practice Locations in Ontario, by a
                        College representative for the purposes of  monitoring my
                        compliance with  the  provisions of  this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Wojcicki, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or
                        any person or institution that may have relevant information, in
                        order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions
                        of this Undertaking.
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Wojcicki, undertake to comply with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and the College shall, in its sole discretion, have the
                  right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach
                  of this Undertaking and shall have the right to proceed with the
                  specified allegations set out in the Notice of Hearing.

            (9)   I, Dr. Wojcicki, hereby agree to bear the risk of any prejudice that the
                  passage of time might cause to my ability to make full answer and
                  defence, and waive the right to seek any remedy on the basis of the
                  passage of time, should the College proceed with any allegations that may
                  arise as a result of a breach of this Undertaking and/or pursuant to
                  section (8) above.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Wojcicki, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this
                  Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
                  
                  
            (11)  I, Dr. Wojcicki, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Wojcicki, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Wojcicki, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information the College's Register that is available
                  to the public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in
                  effect.

            (14)  I, Dr. Wojcicki, acknowledge that the following summary will  appear on
                  the College's Register that is available to the public during the time
                  period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence regarding
                        Dr. Wojcicki were referred to a discipline hearing by the College.
                        As a result, Dr. Wojcicki must not practise complementary and
                        alternative medicine.
                  
                        Dr. Wojcicki shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms
                        of all his primary care Practice Locations, which states as
                        follows: ''Dr. Wojcicki must not practise complementary and
                        alternative medicine. Further information may be found on the
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
                        www.cpso.on.ca". 

            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr.  Wojcicki, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Feb 2016
Summary:

On February 22, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Andrzej Tomasz Wojcicki has 
committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice 
of the profession and has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional. The Discipline Committee also found that Dr. Wojcicki is 
incompetent.  

After receiving information from an anonymous source and from a physician, the College began 
a section 75(1)(a) investigation into Dr. Wojcicki’s practice.  

Dr. X, an independent expert, provided an opinion on Dr. Wojcicki’s internal medicine practice 
and complementary and alternative medicine practice based on his care of 25 patients. Dr. X 
concluded that Dr. Wojcicki’s care did not meet the standard of practice of the profession in all 
of the 25 charts reviewed. In 24 of these charts, Dr. X also found that Dr. Wojcicki’s care 
reflected a lack of knowledge, skill and judgment and that his clinical practice is likely to expose 
many of his patients to a risk of harm or injury.  The details of Dr. X’s concerns include: 

   -  Dr. Wojcicki’s documentation practices do not meet the standard of practice of the 
      profession. For example, he does not appear to use a Cumulative Patient Profile or similar 
      instrument to document patient’s previous and current medical problems and treatment; 
   -  Dr. Wojcicki makes a diagnosis without explaining his reasoning in the same chart note 
      [which] is particularly problematic in light of the unconventional diagnoses (e.g., adult 
      hormone deficiency syndrome) that [he] reaches; 
   -  In many instances, Dr. Wojcicki makes a treatment recommendation without indicating 
      clearly why he has chosen a particular course of action; 
   -  In many instances, Dr. Wojcicki recommends that patients with atherosclerosis undergo 
      chelation and “plaque therapy” which consists of intravenous administration of 
      phospholipids and other agents. This treatment is not considered standard and … if 
      offered should be done so in the context of an approved research study or under the 
      auspices of the CPSO’s Complementary and Alternative Medicine Policy; 
   -  … in several instances, not only with regard to plaque therapy and intravenous chelation, 
      but also in regard to bioidentical hormone replacement therapy… Dr. Wojcicki’s practice 
      does not adhere to CPSO’s Complementary and Alternative Medicine Policy; 
   -  Dr. Wojcicki recommends that patients with testosterone levels below the reference range 
      be treated with testosterone creams, even in older adults (e.g., patients over the age of 65) 
      who do not have symptoms and signs strongly suggestive of testosterone deficiency, and 
      even in those with a history of prostate disease; 
   -  Dr. Wojcicki recommends that patients with “adult hormone deficiency syndrome” or 
      simply “hormone deficiency” be treated with growth hormone [and] in some cases this 
      diagnosis is reached even when IGF-1 is within the reference range….the standard of 
      practice is such that the diagnosis would generally be made or confirmed by an 
      endocrinologist [and] treatment should also generally occur under the supervision of an 
      endocrinologist; 
   -  In many instances, Dr. Wojcicki appears to have ordered tests that are not indicated given 
      the clinical circumstances – e.g., C-peptide levels, FSH and LH levels in women who are 
      obviously post-menopausal, estradiol and progesterone in men, co-enzyme Q10, Vitamin 
      A, mercury, various tumour markers, etc. … the ordering of these tests reflects a lack of 
      knowledge and judgment and is inconsistent with the standard of practice; 
   -  In one instance, Dr. Wojcicki treated a patient with a history of estrogen receptor positive 
      breast cancer with estrogen. Such treatment is contra-indicated and… should only be 
      offered in extremely unusual circumstances with the approval of a patient’s oncologist; 
   -  Dr. Wojcicki treated post-menopausal women with estrogen. Because of the increased 
      risk of cardiovascular disease, the standard of practice is that estrogen should only be 
      used to treat severe menopausal symptoms, for a short period of time, and only after 
      discussion of benefits and risks; 
   -  In at least one instance, he treated a patient with newly diagnosed metastatic breast 
      cancer with unconventional treatments without documenting a discussion regarding 
      chemotherapy and without referring her to a medical oncologist; and 
   -  In some instances, Dr. Wojcicki has provided care to patients with established medical 
      diagnoses and has not treated these patients in a manner consistent with standard medical 
      practice. 
       
In response to the College expert’s report, Dr. Wojcicki retained Dr. Y, a practitioner of 
integrative-complementary/alternative medicine, to provide an opinion with respect to his care 
and treatment of patients at the Vivian Medical Spa. Dr. Y opined that “Dr. Wojcicki’s care, as 
demonstrated in the chart review, did not meet the standard of care expected of the profession. 
Dr. Wojcicki demonstrates a lack of compliance and understanding of the CPSO’s policy related 
to CAM Practice. He has displayed a lack of judgment in his care, and a failure to provide proper 
informed consent. His record-keeping is inadequate. Illustratively, Dr. Wojcicki demonstrated a 
lack of judgment in the prescribing of bio-identical estrogen replacement to a receptor positive 
breast cancer patient. The patient record does not contain any evidence of a consent discussion. 
Also of significant concern is the application of chelation therapy without fulsome assessment or 
proper informed consent, to a patient on whom he initiated intravenous chelation therapy by way 
of email correspondence. As teacher and Co-Chair for the Chelation Therapy workshop for 
ACAM, the world leader in chelation training and whose protocol was adopted for the TACT 
study, it is, in my view, below standard for a patient to begin the treatments in the manner that 
this individual did i.e. without examination by Dr. Wojcicki… Dr. Wojcicki’s [sic] has 
inaccurately described the study results in his correspondence and dialogue with his patients, 
given that the TACT subjects were an exclusive group, of specific age and clear cardiac history 
(not simply hypertensive or diabetic). It is imperative that standard therapies be discussed and 
documented in the patient chart prior to initiation of any CAM modality, according to the CAM 
policy of the CPSO. This fact is not consistently demonstrated by Dr. Wojcicki, nor is there 
sufficient evidence of robust discussion/ documentation of risks of therapies offered or denied. 
This would apply particularly to his management of dyslipidemia and “hormone deficiency 
syndromes.” 
 
 
SECTION 75(1)(A) INVESTIGATION RE: HOSPITAL PRACTICE 
 
 
The College commenced an investigation into Dr. Wojcicki’s hospital based internal medicine 
practice. The College retained an independent expert, Dr. Z, to opine on the 25 patients charts. 
Dr. Z stated that Dr. Wojcicki’s care and documentation fell below the standard of practice of the 
profession in 16 out of 24 charts. 
 
Dr. Z found 4 instances that demonstrated Dr. Wojcicki’s lack of knowledge, including: 
 
   -  In two cases a full dose of enoxaparin was ordered in a patient with severe renal 
      insufficiency; 
   -  An incorrect dose of IV Zantac was prescribed; and 
   -  The wrong dose of Digoxin was prescribed. 
             
With respect to his lack of judgment, Dr. Z found that Dr. Wojcicki: 
 
   -  Did not address elevated troponin and creatinine levels in testing done in the E.R. for one 
      patient; 
   -  Did not acknowledge or treat pneumonia perceived on chest x-ray done in the E.R. for 
      one patient; 
   -  Ordered triple anticoagulation for a patient without sufficient evidence it was needed; 
   -  Ordered medications a patient was taking at home without regard for E.R. clinical status; 
   -  Ordered anticoagulant and laxatives in a patient with bloody diarrhea; and  
   -  Did not consider that a follow-up appointment was needed for patient to receive biopsy 
      results. 
 
With respect to lack of skill, Dr. Z stated:  “There was consistent criticism of inadequate Consult 
Notes and Discharge Summaries. I felt that the Consult Notes were very brief and did not reflect 
the consultation that would be expected from an Internist. The Discharge Summaries generally 
did not provide a good picture of the events of the hospitalization.” 
 
Dr. Z found that the following examples from the charts demonstrate that Dr. Wojcicki’s 
practice, behaviour or conduct exposes or is likely to expose patients to harm or injury: 
   -  Triple anticoagulant therapy based on diagnosis of Acute Coronary Syndrome, without 
      firm evidence to support this diagnosis; 
   -  Two cases of prescribing a full prophylactic dose of enoxaparin when creatinine levels 
      were, respectively, 1479 and 379; 
   -  Ordering prophylactic anticoagulation in patient having bloody diarrhea and ordering 
      NSAID in same patient with history of esophagitis and preplyoric ulcerations; and 
   -  Ordering a dose of Digoxin 0.625 mg instead of 0.0625 mg. 
 
In response to Dr. Z’s opinion, Dr. Wojcicki provided an expert report by Dr. U dated July 16, 
2015.  In summarizing her review of the same 25 charts that Dr. Z had reviewed, Dr. U noted:  
“In general, I do agree that Dr. Wojcicki’s notes tend to be quite brief and more complete notes 
would often be helpful. I would encourage him to be more complete in his note writing/dictation, 
perhaps following a template including all parts of a complete consultation letter. However, in 
general, I find his care to be appropriate. Occasionally I do find that I had to extrapolate based on 
the rest of the chart and other consult notes and orders. Overall documentation seems to be 
sparse, for example in admitted patients there are only progress notes seen. In someone admitted 
for a very short period of time, an admit note and discharge summary suffices as adequate; 
however when patients are admitted for longer durations I would expect to see more 
documentation from the MRP (Most Responsible Physician). This is likely to be a systems issue 
[at the hospital], given that Dr. Wojcicki is not generally the MRP and likely multiple other 
physicians serve this role, and in this sampling of 25 charts I found this to be a common issue. I 
understand that the system of writing discharge notes is often left to the weekend covering 
attending instead of the usual MRP.  This is a system issue, which could use correction in the 
hospital…Similarly another easy careless error which can occur is a mistaken dose of 
medication. This should also have a system level backup, such as with an Electronic medical 
record or pharmacy, which should catch such dosing errors.” 
 
 
ONTARIO HEALTH INSURANCE PLAN (OHIP) BILLING ISSUES 
 

The College obtained OHIP billing information regarding care and treatment Dr. Wojcicki 
provided at the Vivian Medical Spa in the first section 75(1)(a) investigation, covering services 
provided between November 1, 2011 and December 31, 2012. The College concluded that Dr. 
Wojcicki billed OHIP on numerous occasions for services for which there is no documentation. 
In particular 21 of the patients whose charts were reviewed attended for intravenous treatment on 
a weekly or twice weekly basis, and Dr. Wojcicki never directly assessed these patients on many 
of these occasions. They were instead under supervision of nurses. Dr. Wojcicki would do 
‘rounds’ with the nurses to discuss any issues with respect to individual patients.  On these 
occasions, Dr. Wojcicki submitted claims to OHIP using billing codes such as A138, which is 
the internal medicine code for a partial assessment which requires direct examination of the 
patient, without assessing patients directly. 

 
SECTION 37 INTERIM ORDER BY THE COLLEGE 
 
On December 10, 2014, after referring allegations of professional misconduct to the Discipline 
Committee, the Inquiries Complaints and Reports Committee directed the Registrar to impose 
terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Wojcicki’s certificate of registration pursuant to section 
37 of the Code.  The Order required that Dr. Wojcicki cease to engage in complementary / 
alternative medicine practice, among other things.   
 
 
 
UNDERTAKING TO THE COLLEGE 
 
As part of the resolution of the allegations referred to the Discipline Committee, Dr. Wojcicki 
executed an undertaking to the College on February 19, 2016. Dr. Wojcicki agreed to cease 
engaging in any CAM practice and has undertaken not to apply or reapply to practice CAM in 
Ontario.  He must also post a sign indicating this restriction in all locations where he practices 
primary care. 
 
 
 
ORDER 
 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
   -  the Registrar suspend Dr. Wojcicki’s certificate of registration for a period of two (2) 
      months, effective immediately. 
   -  the Registrar to place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Wojcicki’s 
      certificate of registration: 
 
EDUCATION 
(a)   Dr. Wojcicki shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully complete 
      the following educational courses: 
          i. McMaster University Review Course in Internal Medicine (March 30, 
             2016 to April 1, 2016); and 
          ii. Canadian Cardiovascular Research Network course entitled “Gauging 
             the Guidelines” (February 27, 2016); 
 
OFFICE PRACTICE CLINICAL SUPERVISION 
(b)   Within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, Dr. Wojcicki shall obtain a 
      clinical supervisor acceptable to the College, who will supervise Dr. Wojcicki’s 
      internal medicine office practice (the “Office Practice Clinical Supervision”) for a 
      period of six (6) months, and who will sign an undertaking in the form attached 
      hereto as Schedule “B” (the “Office Practice Clinical Supervisor”); 
(c)   The Office Practice Clinical Supervision shall be at a moderate level for a 
      minimum of six (6) months, commencing on the date following the expiry of the 
      suspension of Dr. Wojcicki’s certificate of registration.  The Office Practice 
      Clinical Supervisor will meet with Dr. Wojcicki bi-weekly and review ten (10) of 
      Dr. Wojcicki’s patient charts, discuss  Dr. Wojcicki’s patient care, treatment plan 
      and follow-up, identify any concerns regarding the care, treatment plan and 
      follow-up and make recommendations for improvement;  
(d)   After three (3) months, and only upon recommendation by the Office Practice 
      Clinical Supervisor and approval of the College, the Office Practice Clinical 
      Supervision may be reduced to a low level for the remaining three (3) months,  
      such that the frequency of meetings and chart reviews by the Office Practice  
      Clinical Supervisor shall be reduced to monthly; 
(e)   Within six (6) months after the completion of the Office Practice Clinical 
      Supervision, Dr. Wojcicki will submit to a reassessment of his internal medicine 
      office practice (the “Office Practice Reassessment”) by an assessor or assessors 
      selected by the College (the “Office Practice Assessor(s)”).  The Office Practice 
      Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of Dr. Wojcicki’s 
      care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any 
      other tools deemed necessary by the College.  Dr. Wojcicki shall abide by all 
      recommendations made by the Office Practice Assessor(s), and the results of the 
      Office Practice Reassessment will be reported to the College and may form the 
      basis of further action by the College; 
 
HOSPITAL PRACTICE CLINICAL SUPERVISION 
(f)   Within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, Dr. Wojcicki shall obtain a 
      clinical supervisor acceptable to the College, who will supervise Dr. Wojcicki’s 
      hospital practice (the “Hospital Clinical Supervision”) for a period of three (3) 
      months, and who will sign an undertaking in the form attached hereto as Schedule 
      “C” (the “Hospital Clinical Supervisor”); 
(g)   Hospital Clinical Supervision will commence on the date following the expiry of 
      the suspension of Dr. Wojcicki’s certificate of registration.  The Hospital Clinical 
      Supervisor will meet with Dr. Wojcicki monthly and review charts for every 
      patient where Dr. Wojcicki has been the Most Responsible Physician, discuss  Dr. 
      Wojcicki’s patient care, including documentation and record-keeping, treatment 
      plan and follow-up, identify any concerns regarding the care, documentation, 
      record-keeping, treatment plan and follow-up and make recommendations for 
      improvement; 
(h)   Within six (6) months after the completion of the Hospital Clinical Supervision, 
      Dr. Wojcicki will submit to a Reassessment of his hospital practice (the “Hospital 
      Reassessment”) by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the “Hospital 
      Assessor(s)”).  Hospital Reassessment may include a chart review, direct 
      observation of Dr. Wojcicki’s care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, 
      feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College. Dr. 
      Wojcicki shall abide by all recommendations made by the Hospital Assessor(s), 
      and the results of the Hospital Reassessment will be reported to the College and 
      may form the basis of further action by the College; 
 
COLLECTIVE CLINICAL SUPERVISION 
(i)   Dr. Wojcicki shall cooperate fully with the Office Practice Clinical Supervision 
      and Hospital Clinical Supervision and abide by all recommendations of his 
      Clinical Supervisor(s) with respect to practice improvements and education; 
(j)   Dr. Wojcicki shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Supervisors to the 
      College, and by the College to his Clinical Supervisors, of all information the 
      Clinical Supervisors or the College deems necessary or desirable in order to fulfill 
      the Clinical Supervisors’ undertaking and to monitor Dr. Wojcicki’s compliance 
      with this Order.  This shall include, without limitation, providing the Clinical 
      Supervisors with any reports of any assessments of Dr. Wojcicki’s practice in the 
      College’s possession;  
(k)   If a Clinical Supervisor(s) who has given an undertaking in Schedule “B” and/or 
      Schedule “C” to this Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, 
      Dr. Wojcicki shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an 
      executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is 
      acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that 
      time; 
(l)   If Dr. Wojcicki is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor in accordance with 
      paragraphs 5(b), 5(f) or 5(k) of this Order, he shall cease practising medicine until 
      such time as he has done so, and the fact that he has will constitute a term, 
      condition or limitation on his certificate of registration until that time;  
(m)   Dr. Wojcicki shall co-operate with unannounced inspections and shall consent to 
      the monitoring of his OHIP billings of his Office Practice and his Hospital 
      Practice by a College representative(s), for the purpose of monitoring and 
      enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order; 
(n)   Dr. Wojcicki shall inform the College of each and every location that he practises 
      or has privileges, including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), 
      in any jurisdiction within fifteen (15) days of this Order, and shall inform the 
         College of any and all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of 
         commencing practice at that location; 
   (o)   Dr. Wojcicki shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with 
         implementing the terms of this Order. 
-  Dr. Wojcicki to appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Wojcicki pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,000.00 within 30 days of the 
   date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): February 22, 2016

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 7, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: February 19, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Andrzej Tomasz Wojcicki to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 19, 2016:

Allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence regarding Dr. Wojcicki were referred to a discipline hearing by the College. As a result, Dr. Wojcicki must not practise complementary and alternative medicine.

Dr. Wojcicki shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his primary care Practice Locations, which states as follows: ''Dr. Wojcicki must not practise complementary and alternative medicine. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".