Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Wojtasik, Zbigniew (CPSO#: 52455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SPH 6
1 Aberfoyle Crescent
Toronto ON  M8X 2X8
Phone: (416) 239-3845
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley and Trillium Health P
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7628
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Wojtasik Milkovich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Milkovich ( CPSO# 69284 )
Dr. Z. Wojtasik ( CPSO# 52455 )

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9

Business Address:
35 Giles Road
Caledon ON  L7K 0B7

Business Address:
1654 Bayshire Road
Oakville ON  L6H 4X7

Business Address:
SPH6 - 1 Aberfoyle Crescent
Toronto ON  M8X 2X8


Corporation Name: Dr. Wojtasik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Wojtasik ( CPSO# 52455 )

Business Address:
SPH6 - 1 Aberfoyle Crescent
Toronto ON  M8X 2X8
Phone Number: (416) 239-3845

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 10 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZBIGNIEW WOJTASIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOJTASIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1986