Wolfish, Norman Morton (CPSO#: 18469)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wolfish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wolfish ( CPSO# 62475 )
Dr. N. Wolfish ( CPSO# 18469 )
Dr. S. Aaron ( CPSO# 62311 )

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
1812F - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 739-6636

Business Address:
Suite 311
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 526-0080

Business Address:
Health Services
University of Ottawa
Suite 200
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 1A2

Business Address:
80 Michael Cowpland
Kanata ON  K2M 2G9
Phone Number: (613) 599-3321

Business Address:
7th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 15 Sep 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010