Wolnik, Monica Suzanne (CPSO#: 66563)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 1995


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 46611
Fax: (705) 728-5922
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
480 Huronia Road
Unit 2
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 792-0933
Fax: (705) 792-0966
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monica Wolnik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2014

Dr. M. Wolnik ( CPSO# 66563 )

Business Address:
Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
Suite 102
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 792-0933

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. MONICA SUZANNE WOLNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLNIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1995