Wolski, Darryl Mark (CPSO#: 63848)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Dept. of Mental Health & Addictions
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 49463
Fax: (289) 398-1067
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Darryl Wolski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wolski ( CPSO# 63848 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
Department of Mental Health and Addictions
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARRYL MARK WOLSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1992