Wong, Bill Ike (CPSO#: 57029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 1987


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
100 Queensway Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (416) 561-9660
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bill Ike Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2011

Dr. B. Wong ( CPSO# 57029 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-2222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga


Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. BILL IKE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1987