Wong, Brian Yin Loong (CPSO#: 68870)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 May 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2001


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
865 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone: (705) 5237253
Fax: 7055237263
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Sciences North
Paris Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone: (705) 671-1000
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Y.L. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2006

Dr. B. Wong ( CPSO# 68870 )

Business Address:
865 Regent Street South
Suite 303
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone Number: (705) 523-7253

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. BRIAN YIN LOONG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2001