Wong, Camilla Long-Yan (CPSO#: 79498)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Room 4-002, Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5015
Fax: (416) 864-5735
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Camilla Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wong ( CPSO# 79498 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite 4-002
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAMILLA LONG-YAN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2008