Wong, Daniel Man Tat (CPSO#: 63216)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Mar 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
3410 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1T 3K4
Phone: (416) 293-1978
Fax: (416) 293-3528
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel M.T. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wong ( CPSO# 63216 )

Business Address:
204 - 3410 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1T 3K4
Phone Number: (416) 293-1978

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL MAN TAT WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1996