Wong, Daniel (CPSO#: 22458)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1979

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Fukien, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
828 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1V3
Phone: (416) 603-9009
Fax: (416) 603-7364
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wong ( CPSO# 22458 )

Business Address:
828 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1V3
Phone Number: (416) 609-9009

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1969
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 24 Nov 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1979

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Nov 1977
Summary:

 In November 1977, Dr. Wong pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in 
 Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he made improper use of the authority to prescribe, 
 sell or dispense a drug, including falsifying a record in respect of the prescription or sale of a 
 drug, contrary to s. 26(25); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice 
 of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
 as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 26(31).  The Discipline Committee 
 accepted this plea and found Dr. Wong guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the 
 Committee ordered that Dr. Wong(s licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 08, 1977

Application for Reinstatement  
Decision Date: 09 Jan 1979
Decision: Application Accepted