Wong, Dennis Shonn (CPSO#: 65490)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
256 Pall Mall Street
London ON  N6A 5P6
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dennis S. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wong ( CPSO# 65490 )

Business Address:
302 - 256 Pall Mall Street
London ON  N6A 5P6
Phone Number: (519) 645-0146

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENNIS SHONN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993