Wong, Franklin Tze-Yen (CPSO#: 66682)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York Seniors Health Centre
2 Buchan Court
Toronto ON  M2J 5A3
Phone: (416) 756-6050 Ext. 8093
Fax: (416) 756-1844
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F.T. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Wong ( CPSO# 66682 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
North York Seniors Health Centre
2 Buchan Court
Toronto ON  M2J 5A3
Phone Number: (416) 756-6050

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANKLIN TZE-YEN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995