Wong, Fung Ling (CPSO#: 68743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
328 Highway 7 East
Suite 207
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P7
Phone: (905) 763-0311
Fax: (905) 763-7459
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fung L. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Wong ( CPSO# 68743 )

Business Address:
207 - 328 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P7
Phone Number: (905) 763-0311

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FUNG LING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997