Wong, Gina Sok Heng (CPSO#: 65298)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 15
2006 Robertson Road
Nepean ON  K2H 1A5
Phone: (613) 596-0911
Fax: (613) 596-3162
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lloyd J. Duchesne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wong ( CPSO# 65298 )
Dr. L. Duchesne ( CPSO# 65073 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4512

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GINA SOK HENG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993