Wong, Gordon Kwok Tung (CPSO#: 60768)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 501
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 820-8770
Fax: (905) 820-3703
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon KT Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wong ( CPSO# 60768 )

Business Address:
501 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 820-8770


Corporation Name: Dr. Nicoletta Bonafede Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wong ( CPSO# 60768 )
Dr. N. Bonafede ( CPSO# 65450 )

Business Address:
8760 Jane Street
Suite 201
Vaughan ON  L4K 2M9
Phone Number: (905) 597-3724

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON KWOK TUNG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1991