Wong, James Wailey (CPSO#: 84456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Department of Urology
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: (613) 830-1901
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4289 Innes Road
Orleans ON  K4E 0A8
Canada
Phone: 6136861911
Fax: (613) 8301901
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James W. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wong ( CPSO# 84456 )

Business Address:
4289 Innes Road
2nd Floor
Orleans ON  K1E 0A8
Phone Number: (613) 686-1991

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
Department of Urology
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621


Corporation Name: J.W. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wong ( CPSO# 84456 )

Business Address:
Monfort Hospital
Department of Urology
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
4289 Innes Road
2nd Floor
Orleans ON  K1E 0A8
Phone Number: (613) 686-1911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES WAILEY WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011