Wong, Lianne Catherine (CPSO#: 95727)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Continuing Care Centre
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C6
Phone: (613) 562-6262
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George P. L. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Wong ( CPSO# 95727 )
Dr. G. Wong ( CPSO# 51891 )
Dr. M. Wong ( CPSO# 106184)

Business Address:
306 - 2221 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone Number: (416) 240-0027

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIANNE CATHERINE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013