Wong, Marcus Gaylord (CPSO#: 66744)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6090
Fax: (416) 530-6300
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marcus Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wong ( CPSO# 66744 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCUS GAYLORD WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998