Wong, Michael (CPSO#: 66596)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Health Clubs Building
2021 Cliff Road
Suite 302
Mississauga ON  L5A 3N7
Phone: (905) 276-0205
Fax: (905) 276-8211
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wong ( CPSO# 66596 )

Business Address:
One Health Clubs Building
302 - 2021 Cliff Road
Mississauga ON  L5A 3N7
Phone Number: (905) 276-0205

Business Address:
848 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5C 2S3
Phone Number: (905) 276-2332

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1995