Wong, Philip Ernest (CPSO#: 30270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010


Corporation Name: Philip E. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wong ( CPSO# 30270 )

Business Address:
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9477

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP ERNEST WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1978